+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On July 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.464
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.738
- Substituted For A10172a
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1687
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8881a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Local Government
On April 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
June 1, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor