+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1231
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Women's Issues
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
May 4, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Women's Issues)
- Yeas: 7