+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1122
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor