+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1121
On April 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Votes (2)
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor