+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.99
On December 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.270
- Substituted For A10188a
On May 31, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 8816a
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1378
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 16, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor