+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.377
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.458
- Substituted For A10771
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1971
- Referred To Rules
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor