+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recommitted To Rules
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1970
- Referred To Rules
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8784b
- Amend And Recommit To Cities
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8784a
- Amend And Recommit To Cities
On May 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Vote
June 19, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor