+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A5780a
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 875b
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On March 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.117
On January 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 875a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
March 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
January 31, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor