+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1475
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Vote
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor