+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 24, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.953
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On March 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On March 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.115
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
May 24, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
May 23, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
March 11, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
February 25, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor