+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On August 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.169
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.639
- Substituted For A861a
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 870a
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1380
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 5, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor