+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On November 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter 631
On November 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.716
- Substituted For A9792b
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1673
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8689b
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8689a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On March 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor