+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.82
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.121
- Substituted For A1918
On January 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On January 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.20
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 20, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
January 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor