+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On February 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.39
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On February 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.83
- Substituted For A961
On January 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On January 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.15
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 19, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 2
January 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor