+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1444
On May 10, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor