+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.448
On December 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.191
- Substituted For A10696
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1396
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor