+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 25, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1445
On May 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (4)
May 25, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 17, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 22
- Absent: 1
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor