+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (10)
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1562
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8472b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On May 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8472a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On March 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 25, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21