+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A10500c
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.908
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On July 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 8450c
On July 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 8450b
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 8450a
On June 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (2)
July 22, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor