+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8319c
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1371
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8450b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On April 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8450a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
May 16, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor