+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 3, 2023 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.85
- Delivered To Governor
On February 1, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.77
- Substituted For A2353
On January 24, 2023 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On January 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 9, 2023 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.51
On January 6, 2023 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 24, 2023: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
January 9, 2023: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor