+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On May 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9469
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.959
On February 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Investigations And Government Operations
+ − Vote
May 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Investigations And Government Operations)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor