+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On July 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.109
On June 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.154
- Substituted For A5270c
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1774
On June 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8389b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Rules
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8389a
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Votes (3)
June 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
June 13, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor