+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.389
On November 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.361
- Substituted For A10509a
On June 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1734
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8386a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On May 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 12, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 12, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor