+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 838a
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.281
On February 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
March 12, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 2
February 4, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7