+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (14)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.115
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Health
- Substituted For A10447a
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.42
- Passed Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.656
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Health
- Print Number 8362a
On May 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
May 26, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 1
May 24, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19