+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On October 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.320
On September 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.365
- Substituted For A10549
On June 11, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 11, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1605
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
June 11, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor