+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On July 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.899
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Consumer Protection
On May 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Labor
+ − Votes (3)
July 23, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
July 22, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor