+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9137a
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1226
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8294a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On February 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 10, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 1
- Absent: 1
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor