+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On September 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.196
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.123
- Substituted For A10383
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.737
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
June 8, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor