+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.268
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.355
- Substituted For A10443a
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1602
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8252a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (3)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor