+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1249
On April 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Corporations, Authorities And Commissions
+ − Vote
May 15, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Corporations, Authorities And Commissions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor