+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On June 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.110
On June 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 28, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On May 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.47
- Substituted For A10508a
- Referred To Higher Education
On May 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.647
On May 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Health
- Print Number 8182a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Higher Education
On April 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (3)
May 27, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 26, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
May 24, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor