+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.369
On December 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.358
- Substituted For A10454
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1461
On April 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor