+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On September 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.267
On August 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.315
- Substituted For A8059c
On June 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1597
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8167a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On April 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 6, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 5, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor