+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1389
On April 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor