+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On March 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.604
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Procurement And Contracts
+ − Votes (2)
March 15, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Procurement And Contracts)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor