+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.18
On February 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On February 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.61
- Substituted For A9283
On February 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On February 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Economic Development
On February 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- Restored To Third Reading
On February 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8084a
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On February 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.431
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (3)
February 15, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 50
- Nays: 13
February 14, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
February 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9