+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On July 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.386
On July 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.700
- Substituted For A8528a
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 31, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1657
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 8033a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Budget And Revenue
+ − Votes (3)
June 1, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 31, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
May 11, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Budget And Revenue)
- Yeas: 7