+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On April 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
- Signed Chap.56
On April 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
- Print Number 8006c
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.752
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On April 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
- Substituted For A9006c
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.74
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Passed Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On March 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
- Print Number 8006b
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
- Print Number 8006a
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (2)
April 8, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 7
- Absent: 3
April 8, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 1