+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On September 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.325
On August 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.426
- Substituted For A10578
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Labor
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1281
On May 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor