+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Aging
On June 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7949b
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 7949a
On May 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1120
On March 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Aging
+ − Votes (2)
June 7, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
May 8, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Aging)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor