+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A11044
On May 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.947
On March 12, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
May 1, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor