+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On November 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.497
On November 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.315
- Substituted For A10408
On June 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1325
On May 26, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (2)
June 14, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor