+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1087
On April 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7917a
- Amend And Recommit To Insurance
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Vote
May 9, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor