+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (21)
On November 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chapter 629
- Approval Memo.27
On November 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 17, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On April 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.515
- Substituted For A9336a
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
- Amended On Third Reading 7861a
On March 21, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On March 9, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Agriculture
On March 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 7, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.430
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Agriculture
+ − Votes (3)
March 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 9, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
February 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Agriculture)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor