+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (11)
On June 19, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Employees
On June 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Home Rule Request
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1861
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7860b
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On April 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 7860a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On March 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
+ − Votes (2)
June 19, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor