+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 786a
- Amend And Recommit To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
+ − Votes (2)
January 29, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13
May 15, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 13