+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On March 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.168
- Delivered To Governor
On March 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
On February 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.447
- Substituted For A8797
On January 19, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Energy
On January 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.194
On January 12, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
January 19, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 12
January 18, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor