+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On December 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.544
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
March 3, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor